U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00626
  • Case Name: Wilson et al v. Sauceda et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.