U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00285
  • Case Name: Saucier v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.