U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80193-
  • Case Name: Bennie Russell James
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Amended Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Order Regarding Plan / Amended Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.