U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00859-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.