U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-01041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galloway
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.