U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00283-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Risse-Santos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.