U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pooley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.