U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poenaru
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 15, 2021: [Order]
  • August 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.