U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00787-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sampson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.