U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00777-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.