U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00150-2
  • Case Name: USA v. James et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Continue Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice - Other]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Non-Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.