U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.