U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cassidy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.