U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nolan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • October 18, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.