U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Battle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 28, 2022: [Statement of Facts]
  • December 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 26, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 20, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.