U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00259-JGC-2
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Moss, Jr. et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Travel ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • January 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Travel ]
  • November 01, 2024: [Suppress ]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.