U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00200-JGC-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order of Recusal/Reassignment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: [Order Referring Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.