U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00334-JRA-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Prepare Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.