U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00045-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Garnett et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 11, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.