U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Bond]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.