U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00199-JJH-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fulks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.