U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 06, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.