U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • May 07, 2025: [Supplemental - Supporting]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 11, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.