U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00009-PAG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.