U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 04, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.