U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00777
  • Case Name: Bean v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.