U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-11307
  • Case Name: Andrew Myers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Hearing Docket - bk]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [5 Modify Plan (and Response) and for Compensation]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Missing Signature (bk)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [5 Modify Plan (and Response) and for Compensation]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hardeman, John T. [Motion to Dismiss (trustee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.