open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

OREGON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00247
    Party Name:Manfre-Lane v. South Texas Dental Associates L.P.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Electronically Transferred Out to Another District]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ord.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?151154
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =