U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00149
  • Case Name: American Zurich Insurance Company v. Bissel Homecare, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Association]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Address Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.