U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00448
  • Case Name: S.Q. v. Echtenkamp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • May 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 14, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.