U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01483
  • Case Name: Barrett v. Oregon Department of Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Request]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • March 23, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.