U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Camirand v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Declaration]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment - Terminate Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.