U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01773
  • Case Name: Civil v. Brandenburg
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Returned Mail]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment - Terminate Case]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 17, 2025: [Returned Mail]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.