U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00081
  • Case Name: OFF LLC v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Association]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.