U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00225
  • Case Name: White v. Retina Northwest, PC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case]
  • May 12, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing Held]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.