U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Nelson v. State Of Oregon, Department of Administrative Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.