U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00400-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tovar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.