U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00463-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wandi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • November 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [Reassign Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.