U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00522-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez-Moreno et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [Suppress]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.