U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardona-Zuniga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.