U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Writ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.