U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.