U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maxfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Consent Order Modifying Conditions of Supervision]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Suppress]
  • April 26, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.