U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beckstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.