U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brugada, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.