U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • April 07, 2022: [Reassign Case]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.