U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.