U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order and Report on Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.