U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.