U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toli
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.